+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor