+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor