+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor