+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced