+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen , Sabb, Talley
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 14, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2