+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 296
- Effective date 08/27/14
On August 27, 2014 in the House:
- Veto overridden Yeas-75 Nays-36
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-39 Nays-3
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 314
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-6
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
- House amendment amended
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amended
- Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-13
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-22-14
- Amended
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-21-14
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-6
- Read second time
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: McElveen , Corbin, Turner
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (6)
August 27, 2014: Override the VETO
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 13
June 19, 2014: To override the Veto on S. 813
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 6
May 29, 2014: To adopt amendment
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
May 22, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 8
April 8, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor