+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 195
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 219
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-22
- Read second time
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor