+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen , Malloy, Gregory
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled