+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 78
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/08/15
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 109
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-74 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Horry Delegation
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Horry Delegation
- Recalled from Georgetown Delegation
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Georgetown Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Adoption of Bill
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 45
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1