+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 3
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/20/19
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 6
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 5
January 30, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor