+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Corbin, Young
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 15, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor