+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 189
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 213
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Corbin, Young
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 6
March 6, 2014: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
February 26, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor