+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 139
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/13/14
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 138
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-68 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 51
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2014: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor