+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 266
- Effective date See Act
On October 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 295
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On October 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-4
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Davis
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Murphy, S.Rivers
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
October 3, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
October 2, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 3, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 6
May 1, 2018: Recall from Committee
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor