+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-75 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
May 6, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 41
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor