+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 31
- Effective date 08/4/21
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 44
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-xxx Nays-xxx
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2021: To concur
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 5
April 27, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor