+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 244
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/05/16
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 281
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
April 20, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor