+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 274
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/09/14
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 310
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-20
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 8
May 27, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 4