+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 138
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 142
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-1
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Read second time
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2016: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 10
February 18, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2016: Table commit to agriculture
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 2