+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 310
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/07/14
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 165
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 58
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor