+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-20
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henegan
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hill, McCravy, Thayer, White, Gagnon, Pitts, Atwater, Fry, Toole, William, Magnuson
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2018: Table motion to recommit
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
April 4, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5