+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 259
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 11/19/18
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 288
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor