+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 171
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 01/01/19
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 184
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Introduced and read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor