+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 181
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/16/14
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 198
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 7
April 29, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
March 26, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 6