+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. Whipper, RL Brown
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 38
- Absent: 6