+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 136
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/02/16
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 140
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor