+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for second reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 3, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor