+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
- Amended
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment General
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4