+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Education
- Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-115 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Haddon
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2020: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2020: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor