+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 186
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 209
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Corrections and Penology
- Polled out of committee Corrections and Penology
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Corrections and Penology
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor