+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Owens
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 4