+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Member request name added as sponsor: Fry
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 3, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor