+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-10
- Special order, set for May 20, 2014
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Medical Affairs
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-22
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-29
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Goldfinch
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Barfield
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning, Crosby
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-18-14
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Putnam
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Delleney, Hiott, Skelton, Atwater, Beddingfield, Hixon, Bannister, Hamilton, Hardwick, Goldfinch, Clemmons, GR Smith, Stringer, Loftis, Henderson, Nanney, Lucas, Tallon, Wood, Cole, Allison, Forrester, RL Brown, VS Moss, Weeks, McCoy
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hixon, J.R.Smith
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Loftis
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder, Hiott, Taylor, Bowen
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Toole, Forrester
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Harrell
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hamilton
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2014: To set for Special Order
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 6
March 19, 2014: Adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
March 19, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor