+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-4
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson, Hardee, B.Newton, Forrest, Henegan, Martin
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Kirby, R.Williams, Jefferson, Atkinson
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 4, 2020: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor