+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 84
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 122
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 27, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor