+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
- Pursuant to Rule 47, the bill was returned to the Committee on Senate Education
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Amended
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Hiott, Bennett, Hart
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-2
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Knight
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. GR Smith
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hill, Bennett, Taylor, GR Smith, Magnuson, Hiott, Daning, Knight, Hart
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clary
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 7