+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 220
- Effective date 05/23/22
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 248
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-10
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-22
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2022: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 5
May 11, 2022: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 7