+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 140
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/12/18
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 145
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable General
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General
- Introduced and read first time
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-26
- Read second time
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clary
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor