+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 224
- Effective date 01/01/17
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 256
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-31-16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-24-16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-5
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. GR Smith
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2016: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 4
May 11, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor