+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 38
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/10/17
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 61
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-16
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Young , Sabb, Talley
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 8
May 2, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 4
March 21, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 3