+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
June 4, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2