+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-75
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-4
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 8
May 10, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 75
- Present/NV: 43
- Absent: 6
May 9, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
April 3, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor