+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-39
- Read second time
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-26-19
- Member request name added as sponsor: Mack
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Fry, Magnuson, Tallon, Long, Daning, Toole, Hill, Ott, White, Johnson, McGinnis, Hardee, Bailey, G.R. Smith, S. Williams, Garvin, B. Cox
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bernstein
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2019: Table Amendment 1 Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 2
April 3, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 2