+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Daning, Cogswell
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 27, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor