+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 75
- Effective date 05/17/21
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 91
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hardee, Hewitt, Fry, Brittain, Hayes, McGinnis, R.Williams, V.S.Moss, Lowe, Bryant, Forrest
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2021: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 4
May 6, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor