+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 199
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 251
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-8
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-29-14
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-3
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Bennett
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Daning, Loftis, Crosby, Sabb, Owens, Hiott
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Finlay
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bannister
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 8
May 22, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
April 9, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor