+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
- Recalled from Committee on Corrections and Penology
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
- Introduced and read first time
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-62 Nays-45
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson, S.Williams, King, Alexander, McDaniel, Henderson-Myers, Govan
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Brawley
- Requests for debate-Rep. Murphy, Bamberg, Fry, Daning, Wheeler, G.M. Smith, Weeks, West, Hewitt, Kirby, M. Smith, B. Newton, McGarry, T. Moore, B. Cox, Oremus, McCabe, Long, Burns, Simrill, Hyde, G. R. Smith, McCravy, Wooten and Caskey
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Murray, Gilliard
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 28, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor