+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, R.Williams, Jefferson, Weeks
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Cobb-Hunter
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Davis
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 2, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor