+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 150
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 159
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-40
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. JE Smith, Cobb-Hunter, Sandifer, Funderburk, Lowe, Neal, Bernstein, Jefferson, Ott, Govan, Munnerlyn, Parks, Gambrell, Sabb, Long, Powers Norrell, Ridgeway, Weeks, RL Brown, Brannon, Allison, Williams, Whipper, Hosey, Gilliard, Mack, Forrester, Goldfinch, HA Crawford, Hardwick, Bedingfield, Nanney, Loftis, GR Smith, Robinson-Simpson, Bowers, Pope
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 5
March 26, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor