+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-14
- Read second time
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 3, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor